MS HB1262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Commission On Marine Resources, With The Approval Of The Executive Director Of The Department Of Marine Resources, Shall Have The Authority To Re-designate Natural/public Reefs And Establish A Regulatory Program For The Purpose Of Private Leases; To Provide That At No Time Shall The Commission Re-designate More Than Fifty Percent Of Natural/public Reefs; To Bring Forward Sections 49-15-37 And 49-15-40, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commission on Marine Resources; authorize to re-designate natural/public reefs under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources;Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-06 | House | Amended |
2019-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |