MS HB1261 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Due From Governor 04/24/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Due From Governor 04/24/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Revise Certain Provisions Of The Public Improvement District Act; To Amend Section 19-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Additional Terms Used Under The Act; To Amend Section 19-31-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Timeframe During Which A Public Hearing Must Be Held On A Petition For The Establishment Of A Public Improvement District; To Amend Section 19-31-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Term Of Office Of Members Of A Public Improvement District's Board Of Directors, To Require Candidates For The Board Of Directors To Qualify For The Office By Filing A Prescribed Statement Of Intent, To Provide A Form For Voting By Proxy, And To Require The Appointment Of A Board Member If A Member Does Not Complete His Term Of Office; To Amend Section 19-31-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Public Improvement Districts To Pledge User Charges And Fees For The Payment Of Indebtedness Of The District And To Covenant With Bond Holders To Collect Assessments, Charges And Fees; To Amend Section 19-31-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Special Powers Of Public Utility Districts Relating To Public Improvements And Community Facilities; To Amend Section 19-31-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A District To Hold A Public Hearing Before Issuing Bonds Or Entering Into A Contribution Agreement With A Public Utility, To Specify Certain Information That Must Be Given In Notice Of The Public Hearing On A Proposed Contribution Agreement, To Require Appraisals Of Property In The District Before Issuing Bonds, And To Authorize The District To Invest Monies Not Needed For Immediate Use In The Manner Prescribed; To Amend Section 19-31-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; To Amend Section 19-31-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Prepayment Of Benefit Special Assessments; To Amend Section 19-31-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Timeframe In Which Proceedings May Be Instituted For The Enforcement Of Liens In Favor Of A District; To Amend Section 19-31-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Notice Of A Public Hearing On Proposed Fees And Other Charges To Be Published In A Newspaper Having General Circulation In Each County In Which The District Is Located; To Amend Section 19-31-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Landowners In An Area Proposed To Be Added To Or Taken From A District To Consent To The Change, And To Prohibit The Dissolution Of A District If Bonds Or Other Security Instruments Issued By The District Are Outstanding; To Amend Section 19-31-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Certain Language To Be Included In Instruments Of Conveyance For Real Property Within A District; To Amend Section 19-31-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify That A Notice Of Establishment Of A Public Improvement District Must Be Recorded In The Sectional Or Subdivisional Index In Each Involved County's Land Records; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public improvement districts; revise certain statutory provisions relating to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Due From Governor 04/24/12 | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-11 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-05 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-05 | Amended | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Finance | |
2012-03-13 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Ways and Means |