MS HB1230 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 57-1-16, 57-1-221 And 57-93-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Businesses Located On Tribal Lands Within The Geographical Boundary Of Mississippi To Be Eligible For Mississippi Development Authority Discretionary Programs Through The Ace Fund, The Industry Incentive Financing Revolving Fund And The Existing Industry Productivity Loan Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Development Authority; allow businesses located on tribal lands to be eligible for certain discretionary programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Approved by Governor
2021-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-11SenateReturned For Enrolling
2021-03-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2021-03-08SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-03-04SenatePassed
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Finance
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-02-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
571221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57931Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback