MS HB123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-19-56, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Person Who Is Issued A Disabled American Veteran Plate Or Tag And Also Has A Disability Which Limits Or Impairs The Ability To Walk May Be Issued A Special Decal Indicating Such Disability; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Disabled veteran license tag; authorized disability decal for certain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To MA |
2015-01-20 | House | DR - TSDP: MA To WM |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred To Military Affairs;Ways and Means |