MS HB1205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That A Public Agency Shall Not Require Any Entity Organized Under Section 501(c) Of The Internal Revenue Code To Provide The Public Agency With Personal Information; To Provide Exceptions To This Prohibition; To Provide Injunctive Relief For Violations Of This Act; To Amend Section 25-61-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public agency; prohibit from requesting or releasing certain personal information from an entity organized under Section 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 73 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 69 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2019-03-15SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-14SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-13SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2019-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-03-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2019-02-15HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-13HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-31HouseDR - TSDP: JA To AC
2019-01-29HouseDR - TSDP: AC To JA
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB1205.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1205IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1205PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1205SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1205_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1205_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0370016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0650021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0660040.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0710004.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback