MS HB1173 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Certain Provisions Relating To Disbursements From The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund For Projects In Attala County, Mississippi; To Clarify The Description Of The Authorized Repair And Renovation Of The Historic Rodney Presbyterian Church Project To Be Funded From Disbursements From The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund; To Clarify Certain Provisions Relating To Disbursements From The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund For Improvements To The Existing Rail Line And Related Facilities Running From The City Of Amory, Mississippi, To The City Of Fulton, Mississippi; To Revise The Bridge Project In Hancock County, Mississippi, For Which Funds Are To Be Disbursed From The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
2018 Transportation and Infrastructure Improvements Fund; clarify provisions regarding certain projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |