MS HB1156 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 23-15-557, 23-15-281, 23-15-285, 23-15-35, 23-15-115, 19-3-1, 21-5-5, 21-9-59 And 23-15-283, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That No Polling Place Shall Be Closed Within Sixty Days Of Any Primary, General, Runoff Or Special Election Unless Exigent Circumstances Exist; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Polling places; prohibit from being closed within sixty days before an election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 9 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |