MS HB1137 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Conferees Named Wiggins,Boyd,Barrett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-319, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "community Organization"; To Authorize A Practitioner Acting In Good Faith To Directly, Or By Standing Order, Prescribe An Opioid Antagonist To A Community Organization; To Authorize A Person Acting In Good Faith And With Reasonable Care To Administer An Opioid Antagonist That Was Distributed By A Community Organization To Another Person Whom He Or She Believes To Be Experiencing An Opioid-related Overdose; To Authorize A Community Organization To Store And Distribute An Opioid Antagonist; To Authorize A Member Of A Community Organization To Administer An Opioid Antagonist To Another Person; To Authorize The Department Of Health To Distribute An Opioid Antagonist To Any Member Of A Community Organization Upon A Request Made In Writing By The Community Organization; To Authorize A Person To Store An Opioid Antagonist That Is Distributed By A Community Organization; To Provide Certain Criminal And Civil Liability Protection To A Community Organization And Members And Personnel Of Such Organization; To Bring Forward Section 73-21-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid antagonists; authorize community organization to receive and administer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17SenateConferees Named Wiggins,Boyd,Barrett
2024-04-16HouseConferees Named Creekmore IV,Waldo,Nelson
2024-04-15HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2024-04-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2024-04-09SenatePassed As Amended
2024-04-09SenateAmended
2024-04-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2024-03-21SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2024-03-11HouseTransmitted To Senate
2024-03-08HousePassed
2024-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2024-02-14HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4129319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732173New CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback