MS HB112 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 33-15-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Persons Registered In The Mississippi Responder Management System Shall Be Reimbursed For Death, Disability Or Injury To Such Persons, And That The State Shall Pay Compensation To The Heirs Or To The Individual In Accordance With Payment Schedules Contained In The Workers' Compensation Law, For Death Or Injuries To The Individual While Responding To An Officially Declared Emergency Or During Emergency Preparedness Training; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Responder Management System; registrants receive workers' compensation benefits for death or injury responding to emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations;Insurance |
2016-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Passed |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Insurance |