MS HB1079 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 71-3-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Workers' Compensation Commission To Order An Emergency Hearing Upon Request Or Petition Of Either Party For Such Hearing; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Workers' compensation; require emergency hearing upon request of either party.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Referred To Insurance | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary A |