MS HB1075 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 75-67-601 Through 75-67-637, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Are The Mississippi Credit Availability Act; To Reenact Section 75-67-403, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Defines Certain Terms Used Under The Mississippi Title Pledge Act; To Reenact Section 75-67-505, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establishes Licensing Requirements For Check Cashers Under The Mississippi Check Cashers Act; To Amend Section 75-67-639, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Mississippi Credit Availability Act To 2026; To Remove The Repealer On Those Reenacted Sections Under The Mississippi Title Pledge Act And The Mississippi Check Cashers Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Credit Availability Act, Title Pledge Act, and Check Cashers Act; extend or remove repealer on certain provisions of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 67 | 403 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 505 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 601 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 603 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 605 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 607 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 609 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 611 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 613 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 615 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 617 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 619 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 621 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 623 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 625 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 627 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 629 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 631 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 633 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 635 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 637 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 639 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |