MS HB1062 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That Daylight Saving Time Shall Be The Year-round Standard Time Of The State Of Mississippi If Federal Law Is Amended To Authorize States To Observe Daylight Saving Time Year-round; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daylight saving time; observe year-round if federal law is amended to allow it.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Approved by Governor
2021-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-11SenateReturned For Enrolling
2021-03-10SenatePassed
2021-03-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-23SenateReferred To Rules
2021-02-11HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-02-01HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Interstate Cooperation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback