MS HB1017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Purposes For Which The City Of Bruce, Mississippi, May Use Funds Received From The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
2018 Transportation and Infrastructure Improvements Fund; revise purposes for which City of Bruce may use funds received from.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed |
2020-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |