MS HB1003 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Conferees Named Harkins,Sparks,Simmons (12th)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Conferees Named Harkins,Sparks,Simmons (12th)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-33-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision Of Law That Allows A Homeowner Who Is A Totally Disabled Veteran And The Unremarried Surviving Spouse Of Such A Person, As Well As A Qualified Homeowner Who Is The Unremarried Surviving Spouse Of A Member Of The United States Armed Forces Who Was Killed Or Died On Active Duty, Or Of A Member Of A Reserve Component Of The United States Armed Forces Or Of The National Guard Who Was Killed Or Died On Active Duty For Training, To Apply For Homestead Exemption Within 30 Calendar Days Of The Closing Date For A Homestead Purchase, But Not Later Than December 31 Of The Year Of Purchase; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Homestead exemption; revise time within which certain homeowners may apply for.
Sponsors
Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hulum [D] | Rep. Rodney Hall [R] | Rep. Larry Byrd [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Sparks,Simmons (12th) |
2024-04-11 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Carpenter,Gibbs (36th) |
2024-04-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2024-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |