MS HB1000 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 1, Chapter 411, Laws Of 2011, To Provide For The Extinguishment Of The Reverter Clause On The Property Donated To Tougaloo College For Purposes Of Benefitting The Medgar Evers Home, Upon The Condition That The Donated Property Is Transferred And Conveyed To The National Park Service Or Any Agency Of The United States Government; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public property; provide for extinguishment of reverter clause on certain real property upon transfer to the National Park Service.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Bo Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |
2020-02-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Property |