MO SR1762 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges religious freedom for the Ecumenical Patriarchate of Turkey
Title
Urges religious freedom for the Ecumenical Patriarchate of Turkey
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | S adopted | |
2012-05-09 | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor | |
2012-05-08 | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-03-29 | S Offered--SR 1762-Schmitt |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5707420 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SR1762.pdf |