MO SJR8 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits expenditures of public funds to any person or facility, or affiliate of such, performing or inducing an abortion
Title
Prohibits expenditures of public funds to any person or facility, or affiliate of such, performing or inducing an abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |