MO SJR23 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1098S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1098S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a freeze on property tax rates for senior citizens
Title
Authorizes a freeze on property tax rates for senior citizens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1098S.02C) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled |