MO SCR9 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard H Health and Mental Health Policy
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard H Health and Mental Health Policy
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges greater awareness and services for the treatment of chronic kidney disease
Title
Urges greater awareness and services for the treatment of chronic kidney disease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2023-04-05 | House | H Second Read |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2023-04-04 | Senate | S adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | S Offered |