MO SCR56 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 56-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 56-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May as Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month
Title
Designates May as Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 56-Brown |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 56-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=24522328 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR56.pdf |