MO SCR28 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 28-Luetkemeyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 28-Luetkemeyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes St. Joseph, Missouri, as the beginning of the Oregon Trail
Title
Recognizes St. Joseph, Missouri, as the beginning of the Oregon Trail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 28-Luetkemeyer |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 28-Luetkemeyer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28922380 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR28.pdf |