MO SCR1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for an Article V Convention of states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to authorize the several states to repeal certain federal actions.
Title
Calls for an Article V Convention of states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to authorize the several states to repeal certain federal actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-01-07 | Senate | S First Read |