MO SB912 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 912-Wasson and Justus, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 912-Wasson and Justus, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Missouri Technology Corporation and creates a tax credit for donations to it
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Missouri Technology Corporation and creates a tax credit for donations to it
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] | Sen. Jolie Justus [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 912-Wasson and Justus, with SCS (pending) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-04-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (5819S.03C) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-02-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 912-Wasson |