MO SB90 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 45 & 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 45 & 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to MO HealthNet services for pregnant and postpartum women
Title
Modifies provisions relating to MO HealthNet services for pregnant and postpartum women
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 45 & 90) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |