MO SB88 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to professional licensing
Title
Modifies provisions relating to professional licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review) |
2023-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2023-05-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2023-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2023-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2023-05-01 | House | H Second Read |
2023-04-27 | House | H First Read |
2023-04-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2023-04-24 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2023-04-24 | Senate | SA 4 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Washington)--(0884S09.06S) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | SA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Brown (26))--(0884S09.04S) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(0884S09.02S) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0884S09.01S) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Brown (26))--(0884S.09F) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2023-03-28 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (May)--(0884S04.02S) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Mosley)--(0884S04.01S) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Brown (26))--(0884S.04F) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee w/SCS |
2023-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (0884S.03C) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |