MO SB877 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (3771S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (3771S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Expanded Workforce Access Act of 2020
Title
Establishes the Expanded Workforce Access Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (3771S.02C) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 877-Burlison |