MO SB872 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the taxation of utility infrastructure
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the taxation of utility infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2024-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2024-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2024-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2024-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-05-17 | House | Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading |
2024-05-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-05-15 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2024-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-23 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2024-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2024-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-03-27 | Senate | SS#2 S offered & adopted (Eslinger)--(3392S.10F) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Eslinger)--(3392S04.12S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SS S offered (Eslinger)--(3392S.04F) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |