MO SB860 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 860-Koenig, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 860-Koenig, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to short-term major medical insurance
Title
Modifies provisions relating to short-term major medical insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 860-Koenig, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(4348S11.03S) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(4348S.11F) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (4348S.04C) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 860-Koenig |