MO SB855 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to net metering
Title
Modifies provisions relating to net metering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |