MO SB853 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 853-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 853-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates requirements for co-payments and notice of insurance coverage for occupational therapy
Title
Creates requirements for co-payments and notice of insurance coverage for occupational therapy
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 853-Brown |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 853-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=23921946 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB853.pdf |