MO SB83 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to court proceedings
Title
Modifies provisions relating to court proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 83 (2 TO 2 AND 2, A.A.) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 83 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 83 (HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 83 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: SB 83 (HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 83 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 83 (HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 83 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: SB 83 (HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House conferees allowed to exceed the differences on HA 1 to HA 2 relating to grandparent visitation - motion adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(0303S03.1SR) |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | H distributes CCR (0303S03.1SR) |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate conferees allowed to exceed the differences on HA 1 to HA 2 relating to grandparent visitation - motion adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Cunningham, Sater, Riddle, Sifton, Schupp |
2019-05-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Ross, Rehder, Evans, Mackey, Mitten |
2019-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2019-05-08 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1 & HA 2, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2019-05-06 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | HA 3 H offered & withdrawn (Burnett)--(0303S02.10H) |
2019-05-06 | House | HA 2, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-02 | House | Laid over |
2019-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HA 2 H offered & adopted (Mitten)--(0303S02.08H) |
2019-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(0303S02.07H) |
2019-05-02 | House | HA 2 H offered (Evans)--(0303S02.02H) |
2019-05-02 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Ross)--(0303S02.03H) |
2019-04-30 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Children and Families |
2019-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Children and Families |
2019-04-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Children and Families |
2019-03-27 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-26 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2019-03-26 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | SCS Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee-Consent |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote adopted (0303S.02C) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (0303S.02C) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 83-Cunningham |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |