MO SB820 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 901 & 820)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 901 & 820)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the offense of aggravated fleeing a stop or detention of a motor vehicle
Title
Creates the offense of aggravated fleeing a stop or detention of a motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 901 & 820) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |