MO SB800 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to juvenile court proceedings
Title
Modifies provisions relating to juvenile court proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 (HA 1 HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 (*HA 1 HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 48 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 (HA 1 HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 (*HA 1 HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 48 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 800 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 800-Libla |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Prefiled |