MO SB794 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a sales tax exemption for parts of certain types of medical equipment
Title
Creates a sales tax exemption for parts of certain types of medical equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 794 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 794 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 794 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-13 | House | HCS H defeated |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means w/HCA 1 |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means w/Amendments |
2016-04-12 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-22 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(5094S05.01S) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2016-01-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (5094S.05C) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 794-Wallingford |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |