MO SB791 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that knowingly inciting another to commit suicide is involuntary manslaughter in the second degree
Title
Provides that knowingly inciting another to commit suicide is involuntary manslaughter in the second degree
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 791-Nasheed |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69647436 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB791.pdf |