MO SB753 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows county commissions to invest cemetery trust funds in certificates of deposit
Title
Allows county commissions to invest cemetery trust funds in certificates of deposit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-13 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-11 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-10 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-10 | Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2010-05-04 | Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2010-05-04 | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2010-03-03 | H Second Read | |
2010-03-02 | H First Read | |
2010-03-01 | S Third Read and Passed - Consent | |
2010-02-04 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2010-02-03 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-12 | S First Read--SB 753-Dempsey |