MO SB719 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 719-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 719-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the State Board of Education to develop a simplified annual school report card
Title
Requires the State Board of Education to develop a simplified annual school report card
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 719-Emery, with SCS |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4695S.03C) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 719-Emery |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |