MO SB715 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the enforcement of any federal rule or regulation promulgated by the United States Environmental Protection Agency unless the rule or regulation is approved by the General Assembly

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the enforcement of any federal rule or regulation promulgated by the United States Environmental Protection Agency unless the rule or regulation is approved by the General Assembly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 715-Burlison
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback