MO SB704 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2020-05-13HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-08HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-07HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-05-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-05-06HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-05-05HouseReferred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-05-05HouseH Second Read
2020-05-04HouseH First Read
2020-05-04SenateS Third Read and Passed
2020-05-04SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-05-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-05-04SenateHearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-05-01SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-05-01SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-04-30SenatePerfected
2020-04-30SenateSS#2, as amended, S adopted
2020-04-30SenateSA 2 to SS#2 S adopted
2020-04-30SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-04-30SenateSA 2 to SS#2 S offered (Hegeman)--(3553S05.05S)
2020-04-30SenateSA 1 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Brown)--(3553S05.04S)
2020-04-30SenateSS#2 S offered (Hoskins)--(3553S.05F)
2020-04-30SenateSS S withdrawn
2020-04-28SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-04-28SenateSA 5 to SS S offered (Hough)--(3553S04.02S)
2020-04-28SenateSA 4 to SS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(3553S04.06S)
2020-04-28SenateSA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(3553S04.09S)
2020-04-28SenateSA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(3553S04.07S)
2020-04-28SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(3553S04.01S)
2020-04-28SenateSS S offered (Hoskins)--(3553S.04F)
2020-04-28SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-03-12SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee
2020-02-25SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2020-02-18SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 704-Hoskins
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback