MO SB7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a person who is injured by a product has fifteen years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages
Title
Provides that a person who is injured by a product has fifteen years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Schupp)--(0225S02.01F) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | SS S offered (Riddle)--(0225S.02F) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |