MO SB695 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 695-Parson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 695-Parson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires farm employees who videotape suspected acts of animal abuse to turn over the recording to law enforcement within 24 hours
Title
Requires farm employees who videotape suspected acts of animal abuse to turn over the recording to law enforcement within 24 hours
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 695-Parson | |
2012-03-26 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-29 | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2012-01-24 | S First Read--SB 695-Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=543293 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB695.pdf |