MO SB692 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Motion to Do Pass FAILED H Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Motion to Do Pass FAILED H Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates contracts between insurers and providers of optometric and ophthalmic services
Title
Regulates contracts between insurers and providers of optometric and ophthalmic services
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Motion to Do Pass FAILED H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-24 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-24 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-23 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Wasson)--(4297S.05F) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | SA 1 S withdrawn |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-03-25 | Senate | SA 1 S offered (Wasson)--(4297S03.01S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 692-Wasson |