MO SB690 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a Greene County emergency telephone service board is not a political subdivision unless the county commissioners adopt an order reclassifying the board as such
Title
Specifies that a Greene County emergency telephone service board is not a political subdivision unless the county commissioners adopt an order reclassifying the board as such
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] | Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2014-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent |
2014-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent |
2014-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred H Local Government Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor-Consent |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 690-Wasson |