MO SB666 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 666-Keaveny, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 666-Keaveny, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Large Carnivore Act and creates the Nonhuman Primate Act
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Large Carnivore Act and creates the Nonhuman Primate Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 666-Keaveny, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending) | |
2012-03-26 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-26 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(4032S09.01S) | |
2012-03-26 | SS for SCS S offered (Keaveny)--(4032S.09F) | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-29 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - (4032S.08C) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2012-01-17 | S First Read--SB 666-Keaveny |