MO SB656 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to firearms and corporate security advisors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to firearms and corporate security advisors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateLegislature voted to override Governor's veto
2014-09-10SenateH adopted motion to override Governor's veto
2014-09-10SenateS adopted motion to override Governor's veto
2014-07-14SenateVetoed by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-16SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2014-05-16SenateCCR H adopted
2014-05-15HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2014-05-15HouseCCR S offered & adopted (5082S04.1SR)
2014-05-15HouseH submits CCR
2014-05-14HouseS conferees appointed: Kraus, Munzlinger, Dixon, Keaveny, Holsman
2014-05-14HouseH conferees appointed: Elmer, Jones-50, Butler
2014-05-14HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2014-05-14HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2014-05-14HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2014-05-13HouseH Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2014-05-13HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-05-13HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(5082H03.14H)
2014-05-13HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Webber)--(5082H03.07H)
2014-05-13HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Riddle)--(5082H03.09H)
2014-05-13HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Austin)--(5082H03.12H)
2014-04-17HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-17HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-17HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-17HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-04-17HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-04-08HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
2014-04-01HouseReferred H General Laws Committee
2014-03-31HouseH Second Read
2014-03-27HouseH First Read
2014-03-27SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-03-26SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-03-26SenatePerfected
2014-03-13SenateReported from S General Laws Committee to Floor
2014-02-11SenateVoted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
2014-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2014-01-23SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 656-Kraus
2014-01-06SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback