MO SB645 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies and creates provisions regarding the use of certain training, instructional, and curricular materials in public schools and charter schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies and creates provisions regarding the use of certain training, instructional, and curricular materials in public schools and charter schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06SenateVoted Do Pass S Education Committee
2022-03-29SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2022-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2022-01-05SenateS First Read
2021-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback