MO SB64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gives designation to certain infrastructure
Title
Gives designation to certain infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 64 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 64 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SB 64 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 64 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SB 64 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0431S02.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | H distributes CCR (0432S02.1SR) |
2017-05-08 | House | S conferees appointed: Schatz, Wieland, Munzlinger, Hummel, Curls |
2017-05-08 | House | H conferees appointed: Alferman, Reiboldt, Fraker, Burns, Kendrick |
2017-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HAs 1, 2 & 3 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-04-25 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 4 H offered & withdrawn (Ross)--(0431S01.11H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(0431S01.08H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Cookson)--(0431S01.09H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Rhoads)--(0431S01.02H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation - Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation - Consent |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 64-Schatz |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |