MO SB603 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to virtual education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to virtual education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 603 (898, A.A.) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 603 (898) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 603 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 84 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 603 (898) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 603 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 84 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Re-referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 603-Onder |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |