MO SB593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to financial solvency of insurance companies
Title
Enacts provisions relating to financial solvency of insurance companies
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Wieland [R] | Rep. Noel Shull [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 593 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-04-25 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Insurance Policy |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SS for SCS S adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(4837S04.03S) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Wieland)--(4837S.04F) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (4837S.03C) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 593-Wieland |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |