MO SB577 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Hearing Scheduled S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 @ 12:00 pm in SCR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to degree offerings at public institutions of higher education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to degree offerings at public institutions of higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-23SenateHearing Scheduled S Education Committee
2018-01-08SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 577-Romine
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback